CT HB05432 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - File Number 635
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - File Number 635
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To place the State Contracting Standards Board within the Legislative Department.
Title
An Act Concerning The Membership, Staffing And Budget Of The Contracting Standards Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | House | File Number 635 |
2022-04-26 | House | House Calendar Number 479 |
2022-04-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-19 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 5:00 PM |
2022-04-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-07 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-17 | House | Public Hearing 03/25 |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |