CT HB05448 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-30 - File Number 627
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-30 - File Number 627
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) allow certain election workers to request that their residential addresses be exempt from disclosure under the Freedom of Information Act, (2) establish a criminal prohibition on the possession of a firearm or deadly weapon within one thousand feet of certain election-related locations, and (3) establish a criminal prohibition on, and a civil cause of action for, threatening or harassing conduct toward election workers performing election-related duties.
Title
An Act Concerning Security Of Certain Election Workers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-22 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 5 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-03-22 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-22 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 5 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-03-22 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | File Number 627 |
2024-04-30 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-30 | House | New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-23 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/24 5:00 PM |
2024-04-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-22 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-04-16 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-10 | House | File Number 414 |
2024-04-10 | House | House Calendar Number 270 |
2024-04-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-04 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-25 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |