CT HB06034 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize Sunday hunting of deer with bow and arrow on private property provided such property is in a deer management zone and such hunting is done in accordance with certain wildlife management principles.
Title
An Act Authorizing Bow And Arrow Hunting On Certain Private Property On Sundays.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 441 PASS (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - House - House Roll Call Vote 235 (Y: 110 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - House - House Roll Call Vote 235 (Y: 110 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Public Act 15-204 |
2015-06-03 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 604 |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2015-05-27 | House | House Passed |
2015-04-13 | House | File Number 576 |
2015-04-13 | House | House Calendar Number 366 |
2015-04-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-06 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 10:00 AM |
2015-03-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-03-16 | House | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |