CT HB06498 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To ensure the timely transfer and processing of evidence in sexual assault investigations.
Title
An Act Concerning Evidence In Sexual Assault Cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 473 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 88 AS AMENDED (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 88 AS AMENDED (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-22 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-22 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-17 | House | Public Act 15-207 |
2015-06-03 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2015-06-03 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-06-03 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-30 | House | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2015-05-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-29 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-29 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-05-27 | House | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-05-15 | House | File Number 831 |
2015-05-15 | House | Senate Calendar Number 517 |
2015-05-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-13 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-13 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7100 |
2015-04-01 | House | File Number 359 |
2015-04-01 | House | House Calendar Number 216 |
2015-04-01 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-01 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2015-03-10 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Vote to Draft |
2015-02-13 | House | Public Hearing 02/17 |
2015-02-05 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2015-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |