CT HB06550 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Bill Placed on Senate Agenda, Senate Agenda Never Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Bill Placed on Senate Agenda, Senate Agenda Never Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To ensure fairness in audits of Medicaid providers.
Title
An Act Concerning Medicaid Provider Audits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 358 AS AMENDED (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | House | Bill Placed on Senate Agenda, Senate Agenda Never Adopted |
2015-06-03 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2015-06-03 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-06-03 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9404 |
2015-04-08 | House | File Number 523 |
2015-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 329 |
2015-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-24 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-24 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |
2015-03-20 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | Vote to Draft |
2015-02-06 | House | Public Hearing 02/11 |
2015-02-05 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |