CT SB00039 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To clarify the staff qualification requirements for early childhood education programs serving infants, toddlers or preschool age children and accepting state funds for such programs' child day care or school readiness programs.
Title
An Act Concerning Requirements For Early Childhood Educators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 226 AS AMENDED (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 182 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 182 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-05-18 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-11 | Public Act 12-50 | |
2012-05-04 | In Concurrence | |
2012-05-04 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-04 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-04-27 | House Calendar Number 440 | |
2012-04-27 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-25 | On Consent Calendar | |
2012-04-25 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-04-25 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 2787 | |
2012-04-18 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-18 | No New File by Committee on Education | |
2012-04-17 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-17 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-17 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-04-10 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Education | |
2012-03-05 | File Number 9 | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Calendar Number 50 | |
2012-03-05 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-03-05 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-02-27 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/05/12 10:00 AM | |
2012-02-21 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-02-21 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-02-10 | Public Hearing 02/14 | |
2012-02-09 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |