CT SB00151 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To limit the indemnification of fire service instructors to those instructors who provide such training to their own municipal, regional, state or tribal nation fire department or while employed by the Commission on Fire Prevention and Control.
Title
An Act Limiting The Indemnification Of Fire Service Instructors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 144 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-05-17 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2010-05-11 | Public Act 10-51 | |
2010-05-03 | In Concurrence | |
2010-05-03 | House Passed | |
2010-04-22 | House Calendar Number 394 | |
2010-04-22 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-21 | On Consent Calendar | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Passed | |
2010-04-13 | File Number 521 | |
2010-04-13 | Senate Calendar Number 346 | |
2010-04-13 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-13 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-06 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-29 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-03-29 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-11 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-03-11 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-03-10 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-09 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-09 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Judiciary | |
2010-02-11 | Public Hearing 02/18 | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety |