CT SB00228 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - File Number 273
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - File Number 273
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a pilot program to allow municipalities to transfer some or all of their filing repository duties to the State Elections Enforcement Commission.
Title
An Act Establishing A Pilot Program For Municipal Campaign Finance Filings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | Senate | File Number 273 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 202 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |