CT SB00302 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) expand the tax credit for qualified apprenticeship training programs to all such programs (A) in industries beyond manufacturing, construction and plastics-related trades, and (B) regardless of the number of hours required for completion, and (2) establish a pilot program during the summer to introduce students in grades four to six, inclusive, to various trades.
Title
An Act Expanding The Tax Credit For Qualified Apprenticeship Training Programs And Establishing A Pilot Program For Children Interested In Trades.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |