CT SB00307 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-20 - House Calendar Number 422
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-20 - House Calendar Number 422
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit a person found not guilty by reason of mental disease or defect of causing the death of a decedent from benefiting from the estate of the decedent or from the decedent's life insurance policy or annuity.
Title
An Act Concerning The Inheritance Rights Of A Beneficiary Or Survivor Who Is Found Not Guilty Of Murdering The Deceased By Reason Of Mental Disease Or Defect.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 156 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-20 | House Calendar Number 422 | |
2012-04-20 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-18 | On Consent Calendar | |
2012-04-18 | Senate Passed | |
2012-04-12 | File Number 408 | |
2012-04-12 | Senate Calendar Number 296 | |
2012-04-12 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-12 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-05 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-27 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-26 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-03-09 | Public Hearing 03/14 | |
2012-02-29 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |