CT SB00327 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Bill Passed Temporarily
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Bill Passed Temporarily
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a working group to study the feasibility of a federal Title IX assessment of all municipal recreation areas and facilities used for the organized playing of sports and public school sports facilities.
Title
An Act Establishing A Working Group To Study The Implementation Of Federal Title Ix Protections For All Municipal Recreation Areas And School Sports Facilities.
Sponsors
House Planning and Development Committee | Sen. Kevin Kelly [R] | Sen. Heather Bond Somers [R] | Sen. Tony Hwang [R] |
Rep. Hilda Santiago [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 116 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Senate | Bill Passed Temporarily |
2022-04-14 | Senate | House Calendar Number 380 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4635 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | File Number 268 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 222 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |