CT SB00416 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) make information in the Department of Developmental Services' abuse and neglect registry available to the Department of Administrative Services, (2) allow the Commissioner of Developmental Services or a Department of Developmental Services regional or training school director to consent to emergency medical treatment for an individual under the custody or control of the department, (3) restrict legal representatives of persons with intellectual disabilities from accessing abuse and neglect reports when the legal representative is the alleged perpetrator of such abuse or neglect or is residing with the alleged perpetrator, (4) update the membership of the Camp Harkness Advisory Committee, and (5) excuse the Department of Developmental Services from assessments of individuals in the context of a review of guardianship by the Probate Court where the department has previously determined that such individual does not have intellectual disability.
Title
An Act Concerning Various Revisions To The Department Of Developmental Services Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 386 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 210 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 210 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Public Act 21-135 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-06-09 | Senate | House Passed |
2021-05-21 | Senate | House Calendar Number 525 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-19 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2021-03-09 | Senate | File Number 34 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 57 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/21 5:00 PM |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/08 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |