CT SB00425 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-17 - File Number 526
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-17 - File Number 526
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit health care providers from discriminating against persons in the provision of health care services in the state.
Title
An Act Prohibiting Discrimination By Health Care Providers In The Provision Of Health Care Services In The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 8 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2024-03-28 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | File Number 526 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 302 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/24 5:00 PM |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |