CT SB00445 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To implement various recommendations of the Task Force on the Sale of Cats and Dogs from Inhumane Origins at Connecticut Pet Shops.
Title
An Act Concerning Certain Recommendations Of The Task Force On The Sale Of Cats And Dogs From Inhumane Origins At Connecticut Pet Shops.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 274 AS AMENDED (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 233 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 233 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Public Act 14-77 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2014-05-06 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-06 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-01 | Senate | House Calendar Number 490 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-30 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4552 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | File Number 461 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 295 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/17 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |