CT SB00798 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize the Mashantucket Pequot Tribe or the Mohegan Tribe of Indians of Connecticut to enter into agreements with municipalities to furnish or receive police assistance.
Title
An Act Concerning Police Assistance Agreements Between Municipalities And The Mashantucket Pequot Tribe Or The Mohegan Tribe Of Indians Of Connecticut.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - House - House Roll Call Vote 135 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 76 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 76 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Public Act 17-4 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2017-05-10 | Senate | House Passed |
2017-04-20 | Senate | House Calendar Number 435 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-19 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2017-03-23 | Senate | File Number 202 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 138 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/16 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |