CT SB00903 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make technical changes to certain veterans' affairs statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning Veterans' Affairs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 364 AS AMENDED (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 364 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 364 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Public Act 15-246 |
2015-06-03 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2015-06-03 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-06-03 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-06-02 | Senate | House Calendar Number 679 |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2015-06-01 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8591 |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Matter Pass Retained |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-12 | Senate | File Number 68 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 105 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/11/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/17 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |