CT SB00911 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - House Calendar Number 680
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - House Calendar Number 680
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow individuals to bring civil actions against their employers to recover past due payments to employee welfare funds and to require payments to employee welfare funds to be considered "wages" for purposes of section 31-72 of the general statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning Civil Actions To Collect Past Due Payments To Employee Welfare Funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 355 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Senate | House Calendar Number 680 |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-22 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6473 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | File Number 260 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 206 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |