CT SB00952 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To broaden eligibility for parole to include those individuals serving long sentences for crimes committed before the individual was twenty-five years of age, under certain circumstances.
Title
An Act Concerning Parole Eligibility For An Individual Serving A Lengthy Sentence For A Crime Committed Before The Individual Reached The Age Of Twenty-one And Criminal History Records Erasure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 410 (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 263 AS AMENDED (Y: 100 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 142 (Y: 12 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 143 (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 263 AS AMENDED (Y: 100 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 142 (Y: 12 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 143 (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Public Act 23-169 |
2023-06-06 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-06-06 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-06-06 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-06-02 | House | Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2023-06-02 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-06-02 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-06-02 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9632 |
2023-06-02 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-10 | House | House Calendar Number 510 |
2023-05-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 7578 |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7495 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | File Number 508 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 304 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/22 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |