CT SB00981 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-08 - File Number 732
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-08 - File Number 732
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Concerning Revenue Items To Implement The Biennial Budget.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 31 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | Senate | File Number 732 |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 475 |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/08/23 12:00 PM |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Public Hearing 04/03 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |