CT SB01009 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-12 - House Calendar Number 524
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-12 - House Calendar Number 524
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) require the Department of Children and Families to adopt regulations concerning adoptive placement of children by child-placing agencies, (2) specify the types of payments and reimbursements that may be made by prospective adoptive parents to pregnant parents and requirements for making such payments and reimbursements, (3) specify that a genetic parent's legal representative or prospective adoptive parent's legal representative may advertise through public media for the purposes of identified adoption or adoption through a child-placing agency, and (4) make minor revisions to statutes concerning adoption.
Title
An Act Concerning Identified Adoptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 154 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 7 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2023-05-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 7 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2023-05-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | House | House Calendar Number 524 |
2023-05-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-05-09 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-03-09 | Senate | File Number 42 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 58 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/23 5:00 PM |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/16 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |