CT SB01071 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-01 - Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-01 - Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To change the name of the Office of State-Wide Emergency Telecommunications to the Division of State-Wide Emergency Telecommunications and implement the next generation 9-1-1 telecommunication system.
Title
An Act Concerning The Division Of State-wide Emergency Telecommunications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 306 AS AMENDED (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 199 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 199 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-01 | Senate | Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2015-06-01 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-06-01 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-06-01 | Senate | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9005 |
2015-06-01 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-21 | Senate | House Calendar Number 602 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7461 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | File Number 504 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 305 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 10:00 AM |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |