CT SB01116 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-09 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-09 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To: (1) Implement a reinsurance program; (2) include hospitals in the health care cost growth and primary care spending target benchmark program administered by the Office of Health Strategy; and (3) require certain health insurers, preferred provider networks and other entities to include certain provisions in contracts with health care providers regarding reimbursement for certain covered health benefits.
Title
An Act Concerning A State-operated Reinsurance Program And Health Care Cost Growth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-08 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 49 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-05-09 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-04-03 | Senate | File Number 389 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 225 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/23 12:00 PM |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |