DC B20-1059 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 30 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 30 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
District Of Columbia Soccer Stadium Development Emergency Act Of 2014
Title
District Of Columbia Soccer Stadium Development Emergency Act Of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-17 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2014-12-31 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2014-12-30 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jan 14, 2015 |
2014-12-17 | Council | B20-1059 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary |