DC B21-0724 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-06 - Signed with Act Number A21-0603
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-06 - Signed with Act Number A21-0603
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill makes several restrictions on the services that may be provided by those who provide immigration services. It prevents unqualified immigration consultants from providing legal advice. It mandates that consumers have access to all documents prepared on their behalf. It requires services be performed before charging a fee and among other things makes a violation of the act's provisions subject to the remedies provided under the District's Consumer Protection Procedures Act.
Renamed by Committee to "Omnibus Public Safety and Justice Amendment Act of 2016."
Incorporates provisions from the following bills:
Bill 21-827 - Senior Law Enforcement Officer Amendment Act of 2016
Bill 21-847 - Law Enforcement Career Opportunity Amendment Act of 2016
Bill 21-864 - Tampering with a Detection Device Amendment Act of 2016
Title
Immigration Services Protection Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-06 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-15 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-15 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-06 | Council | Signed with Act Number A21-0603 |
2017-01-06 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A21-0603 |
2016-12-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 10, 2017 |
2016-12-06 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2016-11-15 | Council | First Reading CC |
2016-11-09 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-11-09 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B21-0724 |
2016-10-17 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2016-09-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2016-05-06 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0724 Published in the DC Register |
2016-05-03 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-29 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |