DC B24-0125 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-10 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-10 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 24-125 would entitle a couple who uses assisted reproductive technology to an expedited adoption.
Title
Expedited Adoption Eligibility Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-11-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-18 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-18 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-10 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023 |
2022-12-02 | Council | Act A24-0658 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 014733 |
2022-11-28 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-11-22 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0658 |
2022-11-14 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 29, 2022 |
2022-11-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-10-18 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2022-10-11 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-10-11 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0125 |
2022-10-07 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2022-03-08 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-02-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-02-01 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-03-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0125 Published in the DC Register |
2021-03-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-03-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |