DC B24-0932 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-12 - Returned from Mayor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-12 - Returned from Mayor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Wastewater System Regulation Amendment Act of 2022
Title
Wastewater System Regulation Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-12-20 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-06 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-12-06 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-12 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-01-10 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0737 |
2022-12-28 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 12, 2023 |
2022-12-20 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-12-06 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2022-11-17 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2022-11-17 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0932 |
2022-11-16 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2022-09-27 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-08-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-08-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-07-15 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0932 Published in the DC Register |
2022-07-12 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2022-07-08 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |