DC B24-1078 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-10 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-10 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal Justice Involvement Reduction Temporary Amendment Act of 2022
Title
Criminal Justice Involvement Reduction Temporary Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-11-15 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-11-01 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-11-01 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-10 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 08, 2023 |
2022-12-16 | Council | Act A24-0692 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 015119 |
2022-12-08 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-12-08 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0692 |
2022-11-28 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 12, 2022 |
2022-11-15 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2022-11-15 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2022-11-04 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-1078 Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-01 | Council | First Reading |
2022-10-31 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |