DC B25-0026 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-16 - Committee Mark-up of B25-0026
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-16 - Committee Mark-up of B25-0026
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-26 would establish requirements prohibiting employers from posting a job advertisement without including the minimum and maximum salary or hourly pay information.
Title
Pay Range Act of 2023
Sponsors
Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] | Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] |
Cnc. Zachary Parker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-16 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0026 |
2023-11-14 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2023-06-14 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-06-08 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-05-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-05-10 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-05-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-01-20 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0026 Published in the DC Register |
2023-01-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Executive Administration and Labor |
2023-01-11 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0026 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/52060/Introduction/B25-0026-Introduction.pdf |