DC B25-0039 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-14 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-14 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-39 would require more in depth analysis prior to the surplus of District land and community engagement in real property surplus and disposition decisions. It would establish an Office of the Public Lands Ombudsperson and increase affordable housing requirements in property disposition for housing development.
Title
Common Ground Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] | Cnc. Zachary Parker [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] | Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-14 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-11-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-11-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-02-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Facilities and Family Services |
2023-01-27 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0039 Published in the DC Register |
2023-01-17 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0039 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/52089/Introduction/B25-0039-Introduction.pdf |