DC B25-0043 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-02 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-02 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-43 would repeal the religious exception to the District’s definition of child neglect.
Title
Losing Outdated, Violent Exceptions Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-02 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-10-13 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-10-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-09-28 | Council | Public Hearing Cancelled |
2023-09-21 | Council | Cancellation Notice of Public Hearing Filed |
2023-08-11 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-08-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-02-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Facilities and Family Services |
2023-01-27 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0043 Published in the DC Register |
2023-01-19 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0043 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/52103/Introduction/B25-0043-Introduction.pdf |