DC B25-0051 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Law L25-0151, Effective from Apr 04, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 004423
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Law L25-0151, Effective from Apr 04, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 004423
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-51 would require the Office of Victim Services and Justice Grants to contract with an entity to conduct a biennial crime victimization survey.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is passed Subject to Appropriations. Please see the Fiscal Impact Statement (FIS) for more information.
Title
District of Columbia Crime Victimization Survey Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Council | Law L25-0151, Effective from Apr 04, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 004423 |
2024-01-12 | Council | Act A25-0342 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 000639 |
2024-01-09 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2024-01-05 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2024-01-04 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0342 |
2023-12-20 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 5, 2024 |
2023-12-05 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-11-07 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2023-10-02 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2023-09-26 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0051 |
2023-09-25 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2023-05-17 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-04-28 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-04-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-02-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-01-27 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0051 Published in the DC Register |
2023-01-19 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |