DC B25-0101 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Act A25-0039 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 002989, Expires on May 28, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Act A25-0039 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 002989, Expires on May 28, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifications to Contract No. CW63174 with Immediate Mailing Services, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2023
Title
Modifications to Contract No. CW63174 with Immediate Mailing Services, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | Council | Act A25-0039 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 002989, Expires on May 28, 2023 |
2023-02-28 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-02-27 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0039, Expires on May 28, 2023 |
2023-02-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-02-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-01-31 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |