DC B25-0118 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on January 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-05 - Law L25-0086, Effective from Dec 20, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 000001
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on January 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-05 - Law L25-0086, Effective from Dec 20, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 000001
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-118 would require credit reporting agencies to accept a personal statement from a consumer indicating the consumer experienced financial hardship resulting from a public health emergency. It would also prevent the use of adverse information in credit reports regarding a consumer's action or inaction that occurred during the public health emergency.
Title
Public Health Emergency Credit Alert Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-10-03 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-19 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-19 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-05 | Council | Law L25-0086, Effective from Dec 20, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 000001 |
2023-11-06 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2023-11-03 | Council | Act A25-0282 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 014494 |
2023-10-31 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-10-30 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0282 |
2023-10-19 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 2, 2023 |
2023-10-03 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-09-27 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2023-09-19 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2023-09-19 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0118 |
2023-02-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0118 Published in the DC Register |
2023-02-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |