DC B25-0141 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - Law L25-0026, Effective from Jul 20, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 010344
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - Law L25-0026, Effective from Jul 20, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 010344
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-141 would require health insurers to apply discounts, financial assistance, payments, product vouchers, or other reductions in out-of-pocket expenses made by or on behalf of a member when calculating the member’s coinsurance, copayment, cost-sharing responsibility, deductible, or out-of-pocket maximum for a covered benefit.
Title
Copay Accumulator Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-28 | Council | Law L25-0026, Effective from Jul 20, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 010344 |
2023-06-05 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2023-06-02 | Council | Act A25-0102 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 007912 |
2023-05-25 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-05-24 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0102 |
2023-05-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 25, 2023 |
2023-05-02 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-04-04 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2023-03-21 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2023-03-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0141 |
2023-03-14 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2023-02-24 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0141 Published in the DC Register |
2023-02-21 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2023-02-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |