DC B25-0240 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-09-17 - First Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-09-17 - First Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-240 would provide an abatement of real property taxes on real property owned by the United Negro College Fund.
Title
United Negro College Fund Real Property Tax Abatement Extension Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-09-17 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-17 | Council | First Reading |
2024-07-10 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2024-07-03 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0240 |
2024-07-02 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2024-01-24 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-01-24 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-01-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-01-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-12-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-12-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-04-07 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0240 Published in the DC Register |
2023-04-04 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2023-04-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |