DC B25-0259 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on April 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-21 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-21 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-259 would exempt associate and graduate social workers from examination for licensure. It would form a task force to identify an assessment method for independent social worker licensure.
Title
Social Work License Modernization Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-21 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-07-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-06-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-05-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0259 Published in the DC Register |
2023-05-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2023-04-24 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0259 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/52912/Introduction/B25-0259-Introduction.pdf |