DC B25-0351 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on June 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-06 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-06 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-351 would require that allegations of sexual harassment made against executive branch employees, in positions of power, be referred to an independent investigator with experience in investigating sexual harassment allegations.
Title
Sexual Harassment Investigation Integrity Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-06 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-12-06 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-12-01 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-11-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-11-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-11-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-09-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Public Works and Operations |
2023-09-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Public Works and Operations |
2023-07-14 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0351 Published in the DC Register |
2023-07-11 | Council | Referred to Committee on Public Works and Operations |
2023-06-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0351 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/53429/Introduction/B25-0351-Introduction.pdf |