DC B25-0380 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-08 - Law L25-0078, Effective from Nov 28, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 015613, Expires on Jul 10, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-08 - Law L25-0078, Effective from Nov 28, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 015613, Expires on Jul 10, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
DC Water Critical Infrastructure Freedom of Information Clarification Temporary Amendment Act of 2023
Title
DC Water Critical Infrastructure Freedom of Information Clarification Temporary Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-19 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-08 | Council | Law L25-0078, Effective from Nov 28, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 015613, Expires on Jul 10, 2024 |
2023-10-20 | Council | Act A25-0225 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 013750 |
2023-10-13 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2023-10-11 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-10-11 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0225 |
2023-09-26 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 11, 2023 |
2023-09-19 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-07-14 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0380 Published in the DC Register |
2023-07-11 | Council | First Reading |
2023-07-11 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-07-10 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |