DC B25-0430 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on July 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-22 - Referred to Committee on Health
Pending: Council Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-22 - Referred to Committee on Health
Pending: Council Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-430 would allow the District to enter into the Nurse Licensure Compact which would permit licensed registered and licensed practical/vocational nurses in party states to practice in the District and for multistate licensed nurses in the District to practice in other party states. It would standardize minimum requirements for education and training for participating compact nurses and establish the Interstate Commission of Nurse Licensure Compact Administrators. It also sets up reporting requirements for employers of nurses who hold multistate licenses.
Title
District of Columbia Nurse Licensure Compact Authorization Act of 2023
Sponsors
Cnc. Matthew Frumin [D] | Cnc. Zachary Parker [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] |
Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] | Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2023-09-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2023-09-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2023-07-21 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0430 Published in the DC Register |
2023-07-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0430 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/53601/Introduction/B25-0430-Introduction.pdf |