DC B25-0463 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Law L25-0145, Effective from Mar 23, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 003861
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Law L25-0145, Effective from Mar 23, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 003861
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Minor Access to Medical Records and Appointments Amendment Act of 2023 (now known as "Minor Access to Medical Records and Appointments Regulations Amendment Act of 2023")
Title
Minor Access to Medical Records and Appointments Amendment Act of 2023 (now known as "Minor Access to Medical Records and Appointments Regulations Amendment Act of 2023")
Sponsors
Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Cnc. Zachary Parker [D] | Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] | Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-09 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-19 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-12-19 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Council | Law L25-0145, Effective from Mar 23, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 003861 |
2024-02-09 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2024-02-09 | Council | Act A25-0392 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001479 |
2024-02-05 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0392 |
2024-02-05 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2024-01-22 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 5, 2024 |
2024-01-09 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-12-19 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2023-12-14 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2023-12-12 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0463 |
2023-11-29 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2023-09-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0463 Published in the DC Register |
2023-09-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2023-09-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |