DC B25-0565 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-16 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-16 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-565 would establish a new credential for direct care workers to replace the home health aide and certified nursing assistant certifications. It would also eliminate barriers to certified apprenticeship programs for direct care workers and lower the age requirement for direct care workers to 16 years of age. It allows those certified in Maryland or Virginial to practice in the District and establishes a minimum wage for direct support services.
FISCAL NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. Please see Fiscal Impact Statement for more information.
Title
Direct Care Worker Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] | Cnc. Matthew Frumin [D] | Cnc. Zachary Parker [D] | Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] |
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-16 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2024-07-11 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0565 |
2024-07-10 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2024-06-25 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2024-03-13 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-03-13 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-03-13 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-03-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-03-01 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-02-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-02-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-02-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-11-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0565 Published in the DC Register |
2023-11-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2023-11-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0565 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/54229/Introduction/B25-0565-Introduction.pdf |