DC B25-0610 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-11 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-11 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-610 would grant to firefighters retired from the Fire and Emergency Medical Services Department (FEMS) and police officers retired from the Metropolitan Police Department (MPD) eligibility for rehire at the discretion of the Director of the Office of Unified Communications (OUC) as temporary full-time or temporary part-time 911 call takers or 911 dispatchers without decreasing their retirement benefits.
Title
Retired Firefighter and Police Officer Redeployment Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-11 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-12-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-12-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-12-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0610 Published in the DC Register |
2023-12-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Executive Administration and Labor |
2023-11-30 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0610 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/54390/Introduction/B25-0610-Introduction.pdf |