DC B25-0613 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-12 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-12 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 25-613 would symbolically designate a portion of the public alley system in Square 1071, bounded by 15th Street, S.E., East Capitol Street, 16th Street, S.E., and A Street, S.E., as Cain’s Court, S.E.
Title
Cain’s Way Designation Act of 2023
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-06-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-06-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-12-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0613 Published in the DC Register |
2023-12-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2023-12-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0613 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/54412/Introduction/B25-0613-Introduction.pdf |