DC B25-0696 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-25 - Committee Mark-up of B25-0696
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-25 - Committee Mark-up of B25-0696
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-696 would require private insurance companies and Medicaid and DC Healthcare Alliance to cover vasectomy procedures and services without imposing cost-sharing requirements.
Title
Advancing the Range of Reproductive Options for Washingtonians Amendment Act of 2024
Sponsors
Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-25 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0696 |
2024-08-12 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2024-07-11 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-07-11 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-07-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-06-27 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-06-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-06-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-02-23 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0696 Published in the DC Register |
2024-02-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2024-02-14 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0696 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/54784/Introduction/B25-0696-Introduction.pdf |