DC B25-0748 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-12 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-12 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-748 would symbolically designate the three blocks closest to Blair Circle, the 8100 block of 16th Street, N.W., between Eastern Avenue, N.W., and Portal Drive, N.W., the 1600 block of North Portal Drive, N.W., between Eastern Avenue, N.W., and Tamarack Street, N.W., and the 8300 block of Eastern Avenue, N.W., between 16th Street, N.W. and Portal Drive, N.W. as Joseph P. Yeldell Plaza.
Title
Joseph P. Yeldell Plaza Designation Act of 2024
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-06-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-06-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-03-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0748 Published in the DC Register |
2024-03-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-14 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0748 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/54985/Introduction/B25-0748-Introduction.pdf |