DC B25-0749 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-749 would regulate amplified sound in the public space and update the required specifications for sound level meters to modern standards.
Title
Amplified Sound Mitigation Act of 2024
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-03 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-07-03 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-07-02 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-07-02 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-06-28 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-06-28 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-06-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-06-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-06-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-06-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-06-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-06-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-03-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0749 Published in the DC Register |
2024-03-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Public Works and Operations |
2024-03-15 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0749 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/54986/Introduction/B25-0749-Introduction.pdf |