DC B25-0825 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removal of the Highway Plan and Building Restriction Line from Lot 9 in Square 5914 along the West Side of Congress Street, S.E., S.O. 22-01642, Act of 2024
Title
Removal of the Highway Plan and Building Restriction Line from Lot 9 in Square 5914 along the West Side of Congress Street, S.E., S.O. 22-01642, Act of 2024
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-11 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-06-11 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2024-06-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-06-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-05-31 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0825 Published in the DC Register |
2024-05-20 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0825 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/55501/Introduction/B25-0825-Introduction.pdf |