DC B25-0828 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-12 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-12 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alma Thomas Way Designation Act of 2024
Title
Alma Thomas Way Designation Act of 2024
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2024-06-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-06-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-06-11 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2024-05-31 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0828 Published in the DC Register |
2024-05-24 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0828 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/55524/Introduction/B25-0828-Introduction.pdf |