DC B25-0863 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-07-08 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 22, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on July 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-07-08 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 22, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Green Housing Coordination Emergency Amendment Act of 2024
Title
Green Housing Coordination Emergency Amendment Act of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-25 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-08 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 22, 2024 |
2024-06-25 | Council | Final Reading |
2024-06-25 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-06-24 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |