DC B25-0867 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 15 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-07-15 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 29, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on July 15 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-07-15 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 29, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Family Re-Housing Stabilization Program Protection Emergency Amendment Act of 2024
Title
Family Re-Housing Stabilization Program Protection Emergency Amendment Act of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-09 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-09 - Council - ANS (R.White) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-09 - Council - ANS (R.White) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 29, 2024 |
2024-07-09 | Council | Final Reading |
2024-07-09 | Council | ANS (R.White) |
2024-06-25 | Council | Postponed to July 9th |
2024-06-25 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-06-24 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |